FOUNDATION FOR ACTIVE COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT

Charity number: 1156904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £166.33k £148.94k £174.69k £265.71k £253.90k
Total expenditure £160.34k £158.40k £165.28k £286.59k £218.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £67.13k £51.11k £91.00k N/A N/A