1ST CHASE TERRACE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 January 2017 On time Download