Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES
Charity number: 1155076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Ann Evenden | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sowerbutts | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peggy Jackson | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK HESTER treasurer | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hester | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ross | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Mary Davis | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Kay Cooper | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELIZABETH STONE | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lynne Wilson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Cherry Brooks | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Dorothy Tybjerg | Trustee | 08 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH KAREN SUSANNA FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.