Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES

Charity number: 1155076
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window