BISHOPS STORTFORD SCOUT DISTRICT

Charity number: 1154953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time Download