Trustees BISHOPS STORTFORD SCOUT DISTRICT
Charity number: 1154953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Jonathan Maxwell Stewart | Chair | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc ANDERSON | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jay Oram | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Brixton | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Jones | Trustee | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Beaumont | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Hargrave | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wiiliam Compton | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nick Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CARTER | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.