Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, COPTHORNE

Charity number: 1155185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £171.66k £242.04k £184.52k £170.09k £178.24k
Total expenditure £151.78k £156.58k £264.47k £158.78k £147.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.40k
Income from government grants £500 £912 £500 £500 £500