FAIR FROME

Charity number: 1156185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £45.09k £53.26k £76.79k £87.17k £228.52k
Total expenditure £23.23k £43.26k £55.08k £80.41k £197.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £15.00k N/A £4.23k N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k £26.45k £18.00k £15.00k