CLARETS IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1155856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT MITCHEL WEBB Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Alan Pace Trustee 04 July 2021 None on record
David Leslie Rothwell Trustee 04 July 2021 None on record
David Michael Lawson Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
Michael Lee Garlick Trustee 11 January 2021 None on record
Barry Kilby Trustee 31 July 2015 None on record
Afrasiab Anwar Trustee 04 July 2021
BURNLEY YOUTH THEATRE Received: On time
BUILDING BRIDGES IN BURNLEY Received: On time
LANCASHIRE COUNCIL OF MOSQUES Received: On time
Brian Thomas Nelson Trustee 01 August 2014 None on record
Richard Herbert John Sutton Trustee 31 July 2015 None on record
Shaykh Hashim Al-Kailani Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
LUKMAN PATEL Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
PHILIP ALAN STUART WILSON Trustee 17 January 2014
GREAT BRITAIN WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE QUALITY ASSURANCE AGENCY FOR HIGHER EDUCATION Received: On time