Financial history CARDIFF DEAF CENTRE

Charity number: 1156719
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.43k £5.43k £18.79k £44.26k £43.98k
Total expenditure £12.76k £12.76k £38.09k £45.21k £56.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £1.00k £10.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.00k £10.00k