Financial history SALTASH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.07k £11.19k £14.34k £44.79k £25.28k
Total expenditure £5.06k £5.84k £5.41k £13.01k £20.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k £10.00k £11.00k