Trustees SALTASH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Joy Caves Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Richard Margetts Trustee 29 July 2021
None on record
Corina Clement Trustee 17 March 2021
None on record
Rev Diane Burrows Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Sara Walker Trustee 09 May 2019
GIVE A CHILD A CHANCE
Received: On time
Jill Morton Trustee 09 May 2019
GIRLGUIDING SALTASH DISTRICT
Recently registered
DARREN CHAPPLE Trustee 09 May 2019
THE CENTRAL SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Karen Mary Chapple Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
JACKIE O?MELIA Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
CHARLES WORTH Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
ROBERT MCLEAN Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Rika Chanter Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record