Financial history RUTLAND MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1156103
Charity reporting is overdue by 349 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £56.38k £55.05k £59.58k £74.96k £52.25k
Total expenditure £52.67k £55.69k £66.28k £88.40k £58.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.64k £52.64k £51.76k N/A £52.25k