Trustees RUTLAND MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1156103
Charity reporting is overdue by 349 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER DAVIS Chair 14 February 2014
ARTS FOR RUTLAND
Received: On time
THE HELEN DAVIS FAMILY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROBERT EDWARD CLAYTON Trustee 05 December 2019
LIBRARIES AND INFORMATION EAST MIDLANDS
Received: 17 days late
Robert Gooding Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record
Susannah Melanie Wass Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
Benjamin James Solly Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record