Trustees PENDLE DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathleen Edwina Yates Trustee 23 August 2021
None on record
Joanna Wood Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Pamela Greenwood Trustee 30 June 2015
None on record
Trevor Brunton Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Kieron Clemance Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
AVERIL ASTIN Trustee 05 April 2012
None on record
ANITA HAWORTH Trustee 12 November 1998
None on record
Valerie Pickles Trustee 01 December 1990
None on record