FOREVER ACTIVE FORUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1159692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £90.76k £69.01k £83.76k £166.60k £105.70k
Total expenditure £57.90k £93.22k £106.41k £138.75k £100.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.25k £0 N/A £51.18k N/A