Accounts and annual returns THE ROCK ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 July 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window