WEST HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1160370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £41.95k £40.15k £43.37k £42.25k £31.03k
Total expenditure £36.83k £50.92k £38.45k £41.64k £30.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A £500 £17.34k