Accounts and annual returns LONDON FESTIVAL OF BAROQUE MUSIC

Charity number: 1160689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2021 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 October 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 October 2021 140 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 October 2021 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 18 October 2021 505 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 October 2021 871 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 18 October 2021 871 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 August 2018 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 August 2018 84 days late Download Open in new window