MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required