COMMUNITY OF TIGRAYAN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1158762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.57k £344 £17.64k £31.88k £42.17k
Total expenditure £5.71k £1.20k £4.84k £24.89k £21.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £23.20k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k