FUTURE INCLUSIONS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1159918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andy Smith Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
Adilson Da Trinidade Rita Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
Dr WILLIAM JAMES ROBINSON Chair 01 January 2015 None on record
Shareeka Robinson Trustee 14 January 2021 None on record
Kendall Banks-Browne Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record