PRINCE OF WALES ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK & IRELAND

Charity number: 1158526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £52.29k £44.36k £43.07k £33.66k £25.15k
Total expenditure £41.13k £38.66k £35.88k £31.26k £29.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A