PRINCE OF WALES ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK & IRELAND

Charity number: 1158526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 25 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 29 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download