WHITBY HIDDEN IMPAIRMENTS SUPPORT AND HELP

Charity number: 1160390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £61.67k £46.37k £110.01k £112.94k £85.32k
Total expenditure £40.83k £63.06k £89.03k £105.58k £73.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.85k £7.12k £1.18k N/A N/A