Financial history WOOLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.03k £23.94k £25.60k £40.22k £32.69k
Total expenditure £31.34k £20.52k £23.03k £42.34k £22.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A £26.82k £11.48k