THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S, TENTERDEN KENT

Charity number: 1159264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £23.98k £22.37k £27.31k £27.77k £22.24k
Total expenditure £11.24k £13.46k £9.06k £7.56k £7.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £600 £500 £600