THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S, TENTERDEN KENT

Charity number: 1159264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Harry Kneller Trustee 20 October 2019 None on record
TIMOTHY CHARLES MONCKTON Chair 21 October 2016
WHITEHEAD MONCKTON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Overdue by 141 days
ROY ANTHONY ISWORTH Trustee 08 October 2014
THE VICAR OF TENTERDEN'S TRUST Received: On time
TENTERDEN AND DISTRICT DAY CENTRE Received: On time
Professor Jeremy Denison Cooper Trustee 28 October 2020 None on record
Stephanie Anne Marshall Trustee 10 April 2017 None on record