RUGBY DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1160535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required