RUGBY DEMENTIA SUPPORT

Charity number: 1160535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.27k £15.30k £9.26k £10.88k £6.51k
Total expenditure £5.77k £7.35k £9.89k £7.41k £7.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A