BASLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1162216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.39k £13.98k £18.26k £18.39k £22.10k
Total expenditure £17.56k £15.02k £17.12k £15.98k £11.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.60k N/A £2.60k £1.00k £20.57k