CORNWALL MUSIC SERVICE TRUST

Charity number: 1159622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.32m £1.43m £1.51m £1.61m £1.47m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.40m £1.48m £1.47m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £44.00k £66.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £461.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.04k £41.60k £25.75k £61.66k £485.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.39m £1.46m £1.51m £942.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £236 £704
Income - Other £0 £0 £30.77k £37.53k £43.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.40m £1.48m £1.47m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.84k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £3.72k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0