AXMINSTER SKATEPARK

Charity number: 1161283
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oliver Stevenson Tucker Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
Jennifer Louise Hall Trustee 29 August 2019 None on record
Peter Measures Trustee 24 January 2016 None on record
Eve Iona Chubb Trustee 21 October 2017 None on record
STEVEN BELFORD LITTLEY Trustee 23 August 2016 None on record
IAN LLOYD HALL Trustee 23 August 2016
CLOAKHAM LAWN SPORTS CENTRE Received: On time
CRAIG BILLINGTON Trustee 23 August 2016 None on record
ANDREW TIMOTHY MOULDING Trustee 21 October 2017
THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER Received: On time
VIRTUE AND HONOR MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION Overdue by 507 days
THE CLOWANCE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE TONY COLES CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUTH CRICKET
CLOAKHAM LAWN SPORTS CENTRE Received: On time