THE ANSTICE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1162626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.99k £32.16k £61.12k £267.67k £214.21k
Total expenditure £20.89k £19.53k £21.43k £118.72k £190.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £4.04k £580 £6.66k £62.00k