Trustees ETHNIC MINORITY WELSH WOMEN ACHIEVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MEENA UPADHYAYA FRCPATH Chair 10 October 2010
None on record
Suzanne Maria Smart Trustee 11 January 2022
NEW DIMENSIONS FAITH FELLOWSHIP
Recently registered
Shehla Khan Trustee 17 September 2020
ETHNIC YOUTH SUPPORT TEAM
Received: On time
Kaori Onoda Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Temmy Woolston Trustee 29 November 2019
None on record
Maria Christina Lazarou Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Dr Tania Ghafari Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Nisha Rawindaran Trustee 19 August 2018
None on record
CHETNA SINHA Trustee 04 January 2017
ROYAL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY OF WALES
Received: On time
SIVANESWARY SIVAPALAN Trustee 16 July 2015
None on record
VIMLABEN HARILAL PATEL MBE Trustee 10 October 2010
HINDU COUNCIL OF WALES
Received: On time