Trustees RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 505630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE SHUTTLEWORTH Chair
None on record
IAN JOHN TOWNEND Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
DAVID MILNER Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
ARGYRO WEST Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
Gary Paul Woods Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
Dr Eleanor Moran Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
Paul Julian Fox Trustee 26 May 2018
None on record
Emma Slater Trustee 22 January 2018
None on record
Simon Brazier Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
VANESSA MONNICKENDAM Trustee 11 February 2014
None on record