S2 FOOD POVERTY NETWORK

Charity number: 1162137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £50.41k £67.43k £74.82k £89.13k £144.79k
Total expenditure £51.16k £64.09k £64.68k £87.73k £138.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £5.60k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.48k £0 £3.10k N/A £1.50k