Trustees S2 FOOD POVERTY NETWORK
Charity number: 1162137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
lucy joanna warren | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
james frances steinke | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Geraldine Ann Roberts | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christine McKee | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sibylle Eva Nothhelfer-Batten | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Sioned-Mair Richards | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jill Whyms | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
John Hull | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Terence Gallagher | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DEBORAH MATHEWS | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
John Le Corney | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.