Financial history CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1160384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £52.60m £41.20m £45.44m £52.40m £50.54m
Total expenditure £53.00m £47.92m £45.93m £48.94m £49.81m
Income from government contracts £0 £2.42k £90.80k £2.37m £181.93k
Income from government grants £3.19m £2.19m £2.22m £2.37m £1.07m
Income - Donations and legacies £35.79m £30.67m £33.67m £36.99m £37.96m
Income - Other trading activities £27.00k £16.00k £37.00k £0 £23.00k
Income - Charitable activities £16.64m £10.01m £11.63m £15.29m £12.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £153.00k £107.00k £108.00k £48.00k £75.00k
Income - Other £0 £398.00k £0 £76.00k £8.00k
Income - Legacies £9.30m £8.48m £10.52k £11.49m £11.00m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £47.64m £42.70m £40.29m £43.12m £43.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.36m £5.23m £5.65m £5.83m £6.33m
Expenditure - Governance £426.00k £468.00k £550.00k £515.00k £386.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £28.30m £24.08m £21.65m £26.53m £27.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0