Trustees CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1160384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Rev JOHN STANLEY KENNETH ARNOLD Chair 10 December 2009
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: 21 days late
THE ATLANTIC TRADING CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 281 days
THE NEWMAN TRUST
Received: On time
ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
Rev George Dhanasegaran Sigamoney Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Rosanne Mary Beatrix Kay Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Gabriela Flores Zavala Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Rev Stephen James Lawrence Wright Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
Rev Mark Odion Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Charlotte Rose Trustee 28 August 2018
None on record
John James Guy Trustee 20 February 2017
FAIRFIELD RESIDENTIAL HOME
Received: On time
THE MERRY BELLS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Professor Karen Kilby Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
Christopher John Perry Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
Mary Veronica Ward Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
JOHN CHARLES DARLEY Trustee 09 December 2016
DEPAUL INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
MARY NEY Trustee 09 December 2016
ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
Overdue by 97 days
DOMINIC JERMEY OBE CVO Trustee 09 December 2016
None on record