SOUTH DOWNS LEISURE

Charity number: 1163564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PRINCE KRIS VON HABSBURG Chair 05 February 2015 None on record
Charles John Ellerington James Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Andrew Fleetwood Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
JOANNE ROSE MARIE LAWRENCE-HALL Trustee 05 February 2015
THE TALBOT HOUSE TRUST Received: On time
Paula Beverley Spencer-Snell Trustee 26 October 2020
OFFINGTON COUNSELLING SERVICE Received: On time
Sharon Price Trustee 03 November 2015 None on record
Rachel Ramdin Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
Phillip Griffin Trustee 24 August 2020 None on record
Paula Newton Trustee 24 August 2020 None on record