Trustees COATES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 505906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BUTLER Chair 01 March 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PONTELAND
Received: On time
ROBERT GUY RAMSAY Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
Revd Captain Paul Allison Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
ANDREW WILLIAM MORGAN Trustee 18 October 2013
THE NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY YOUTH CRICKET CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ANNA ROSA FORSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTINE ANNE GREENWELL Trustee 17 October 2013
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
MERTON HALL RECREATION CENTRE
Recently registered
ALAN NEVILLE MEE Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
GILLIAN BUNTING Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
CLIVE RINGROSE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PONTELAND
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MATTHEW Trustee
None on record