WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK

Charity number: 1161880
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.05k £546 £19.74k £4.43k £1.16k
Total expenditure £20.80k £5.53k £4.62k £16.04k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.68k £0 £11.34k N/A N/A