WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK

Charity number: 1161880
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH COLEMAN Trustee 31 January 2017 None on record
Susan Smith Trustee 28 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
GILLIAN ANNE DARBYSHIRE Trustee 28 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
STEPHEN JOHN BARKER Trustee 26 January 2015 None on record
JONATHAN FREDERIC SMITH Chair 28 May 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
MARTIN JOHN HIGHTON Trustee 31 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
MARK DARBYSHIRE Trustee 22 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
CTF TRAINING
JAN MARGARET MOODIE Trustee 31 January 2017 None on record
JUNE MARGARET BROWN Trustee 28 January 2015
WHALLEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
ADAM COTTAM'S ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
JOHN STEPHEN KENNY Trustee 31 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
MICHAEL THOMAS SEERY Trustee 28 January 2015
QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS Received: 4 days late
WHALLEY VILLAGE HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Overdue by 120 days
DAVID SLEIGHT Trustee 28 January 2015 None on record