Accounts and annual returns Bright Young Minds

Charity number: 1164102
Charity reporting is overdue by 138 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 138 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 138 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 March 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 April 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required