Financial history Bright Young Minds

Charity number: 1164102
Charity reporting is overdue by 146 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £18.50k £4.97k £10.77k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £15.80k £1.20k £8.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A