FULL CIRCLE FUND THERAPIES

Charity number: 1162010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 13 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download