LAKESIDE C.A.

Charity number: 506125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 March 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required