LAKESIDE C.A.

Charity number: 506125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.82k £13.66k £12.41k £5.94k £11.97k
Total expenditure £2.77k £11.39k £4.96k £7.95k £13.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A £10.00k