Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST LAURENCE

Charity number: 1165174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 December 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 December 2019 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 December 2019 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 December 2018 37 days late Download Open in new window